MS SB2377 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Distinction In The Seriousness Of Murder To Be Denominated As First- And Second-degree Murder; To Amend Section 97-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Punishment For Murder To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Murder; distinguish between first- and second-degree of.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Chris Massey [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Gray Tollison [D] |
Sen. William Longwitz [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-04-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Shirley, Baker, Reynolds) |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Lamar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Simmons (12th),Tindell |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-07 | House | Amended |
2013-03-07 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Shirley, Baker, Reynolds) |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |