MS SB2375 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The State Board Of Contractors To Conduct Regular Meetings Through Teleconference And Video Means; To Amend Section 31-3-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 1555, 2010 Regular Session, To Revise The Application Procedure For A Certificate Of Responsibility Issued By The State Board Of Contractors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Board of Contractors; may conduct meetings through teleconferencing/revise application procedure.
Sponsors
Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Bailey,Evans (91st),Jones (111th) | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Jackson (15th),Flowers,Ward | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |