MS SB2372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The State Veterans Affairs Board To Establish, Operate And Maintain A Mississippi Persian Gulf War Memorial In Newton County, Mississippi; To Authorize The State Veterans Affairs Board To Receive Federal Aid And Any Gifts, Contributions, Bequests And Reimbursements To Establish, Operate And Maintain Such Memorial; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Persian Gulf War Memorial; authorize State Veterans Affairs Board to establish in Newton County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | DR - TSDPAA: MA To AP | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Military Affairs;Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |