MS SB2371 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The American Rescue Plan Act (arpa) Nurse/allied Health Workforce Development And Retention Act; To State Legislative Findings And Intent; To Establish The Accelerate Mississippi Nursing/allied Health Grant Program; To Establish The Accelerate Mississippi Physician Residency And Fellowship Start-up Grant Program; To Establish And Administer The Mississippi Allied Health College And Career Navigator Grant Program; To Outline Requirements For The Applications And For The Grant Awards; To Allow The Office Of Workforce Development To Use A Maximum Of 2% Of Funds Appropriated For The Administrative Expenses Of The Grant Programs, To The Extent Permissible Under Federal Law; To Direct The Office To Try To Minimize Any Expense Of Administrative Funds By Establishing Policies And Procedures Mirroring Past Programs Utilizing Federal Covid-19 Relief Funds; To Require The Office Of Workforce Development To Certify To The Department Of Finance And Administration That Each Expenditure Appropriated To The Office Is In Compliance With United States Department Of The Treasury Criteria Regarding The Use Of Monies From The Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund; To Provide Reporting Requirements To The Governor And The Legislature By October 1 Of Each Year; To Provide That Grant Funds Shall Be Available Through December 31, 2026, Or On The Date Of The Fund Expenditure Deadline Provided By The Federal Government, Whichever Occurs Later; To Provide That Each Grant Recipient Shall Certify, For Any Project For Which A Grant Is Awarded, That If The Project Is Not Completed By December 31, 2026, And The United States Congress Does Not Enact An Extension Of The Deadline On The Availability Of Arpa Funds, Then The Grant Recipient Will Complete The Project Through Other Funds; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Rescue Plan Act (ARPA) Nurse/Allied Health Workforce Development and Retention Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17 Approved by Governor
2023-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2023-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2023-03-25HouseConference Report Filed
2023-03-25SenateConference Report Filed
2023-03-21HouseConferees Named Bell (21st),Felsher,Anthony
2023-03-17SenateConferees Named Parker,McMahan,Chassaniol
2023-03-13SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2023-03-08HouseReturned For Concurrence
2023-03-07HousePassed As Amended
2023-03-07HouseAmended
2023-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2023-02-28HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To WD
2023-02-22HouseDR - TSDPAA: WD To AP
2023-02-14HouseReferred To Workforce Development;Appropriations
2023-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2023-02-08SenatePassed As Amended
2023-02-08SenateAmended
2023-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-24SenateDR - TSDP: EC To AP
2023-01-16SenateReferred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/history/SB/SB2371.xml
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2371IN.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2371PS.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2371SG.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/sam/SB2371_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2371_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2371_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2371_H_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2371_H_Amend_04.htm
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/senate/0370050.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/house/0640006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/senate/0840024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/house/0850048.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback