MS SB2362 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-67-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Used To Provide Funds To Assist Municipalities In Paying Costs Associated With Road And Bridge Improvements And Water And Sewer Infrastructure Improvements, To Provide That For Purposes Of Calculating Certain Average Annual Expenditures That A Municipality Must Expend In Order To Be Eligible For Monies From The Special Fund, Grant Funds And Loan Funds Received By A Municipality And Expended For Such Purposes Shall Not Be Considered When Calculating The Average Annual Expenditures; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax; revise certain provisions regarding distribution of funds to municipalities for road and bridge improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-03 Approved by Governor
2020-06-28HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-28SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-25SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-24HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-24SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-23HouseConferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Harkins,McMahan,Blackmon
2020-06-16SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-11HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-11HouseMotion to Reconsider W/Drawn
2020-06-10HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hopkins, Lamar, Steverson)
2020-06-10HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-10HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-03-13HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-13SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback