MS SB2357 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Allow Counties To Pay The Reasonable Hospital And Medical Expenses For Paid Or Volunteer Fire Department Members Suffering Injury Or Illness Incurred In The Line Of Duty; To Allow Counties To Provide Accident, Death Or Disability Policies To Paid Or Volunteer Fire Department Members; To Allow Counties To Purchase Insurance Coverage For The Medical Costs And Expenses Incurred In The Line Of Duty Of Paid Or Volunteer Fire Department Members; To Amend Section 21-25-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Municipalities To Pay The Premiums For Accident, Death And Disability Policies And Insurance Coverage For The Medical Costs And Expenses Incurred In The Line Of Duty For Paid Or Volunteer Fire Department Members; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Volunteer firefighters; allow local governments to pay certain expenses for injury, illness and insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Robinson |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Blackwell,DeLano |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |