MS SB2355 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Lower The Age Of Majority From 21 To 18; To Amend Section 1-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of Infant; To Amend Section 1-3-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of Minor; To Amend Section 11-5-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To Sale Or Conveyance Of A Minor's Property; To Amend Section 11-46-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Savings Clause Of The Tort Claims Act To Conform; To Amend Sections 13-5-1 And 13-5-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Age Of Jury Service; To Amend Section 15-1-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Limitations Applicable To Actions Or Suits To Cancel Tax Titles To Conform; To Amend Section 15-1-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Limitations Applicable To An Action By A Ward Against A Guardian Or Surety; To Amend Section 15-1-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Saving In Favor Of Persons Under Disability Of Unsoundness Of Mind Within The Chapter Addressing The Limitations Of Civil Actions; To Amend Section 21-15-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Militia Power Of The Mayor To Conform; To Amend Section 25-4-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "household Member" Within The Article Establishing The Mississippi Ethics Commission To Conform; To Amend Section 41-29-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Punishment Of The Distribution Of Controlled Substances To Minors To Conform; To Amend Section 43-19-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Age Of Mandatory Support In An Order Of Filiation; To Amend Section 91-5-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To Age Of Issue Capable Of Inheriting; To Amend Section 91-7-293, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To Final Accounting By The Heirs Of An Estate; To Amend Section 91-20-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To Transfers To Minors Within Trust And Estate Law; To Amend Section 91-20-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Custodians To Transfer Certain Custodial Property To A Minor's Estate To Conform; To Amend Section 93-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Age For Issuance Of A Marriage License; To Amend Section 93-9-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Provisions As To Age For The Terms Of A Decree For Removal Of The Disability Of A Minor; To Amend Section 93-11-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Age Of Emancipation; To Amend Section 93-14-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of The Term "adult" For The Purposes Of The Uniform Adult Guardianship And Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act; To Amend Section 93-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definition Of The Term "minor Parent" In The Termination Of Parental Rights Law; To Amend Section 93-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To The Age Of Parents In An Adoption; To Amend Section 93-17-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions Concerning Adoption Records To Conform; To Amend Section 93-17-215, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To A Person's Authority To Request Certain Information Concerning Adoption; To Amend Section 93-19-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Age For Removal Of Disability As To Real Estate; To Amend Section 93-19-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Provisions As To The Terms Of A Decree Removing The Disability Of Minority; To Amend Section 93-20-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Age Of Majority Under Guardianship And Conservatorship Law To Conform; To Amend Section 97-33-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Penalty For Gambling With A Known Minor; To Amend Section 99-3-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform As To Which Persons Must Be Given Certain Notice Upon Release From Arrest; To Repeal Section 35-7-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Removal Of The Disabilities Of Minority Of Certain Veterans; To Repeal Section 91-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Removal Of The Disabilities Of Minority For Certain Executors, Executrixes, Administrators Or Administratrixes; To Repeal Section 93-3-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Removal Of The Disabilities Of Minority Of Certain Married Persons With Respect To Homestead Transactions; To Repeal Section 93-19-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That All Persons 18 Years Of Age Or Older, If Not Otherwise Disqualified, Shall Have The Capacity To Enter Into Binding Contractual Relationships Affecting Personal Property And That An 18-year-old May Sue And Be Sued In His Own Name As An Adult And Be Served With Process As An Adult; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Age of majority; revise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseDied In Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2021-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-10SenatePassed
2021-02-10SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-02-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-15SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
114611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
115115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
211513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2543Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35743Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4129145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
912041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
917293Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91737Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
9315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
931165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9314102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9315103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9317205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9317215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
931913Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
93199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9320102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93311Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
9399Amended CodeSee Bill Text
973323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
99345Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback