MS SB2351 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section To Be Added To Title 23, Chapter 15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Attorney General's Office To Investigate Complaints Of Election Fraud; To Provide Procedures For Which The Attorney General Should Follow To Share The Findings Of An Election Fraud Investigation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Elections; allow the Attorney General to investigate alleged election fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EL To AC |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |