MS SB2343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 21-23-3 And 21-23-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Population Threshold Over Which A Municipality Is Required To Appoint A Municipal Judge, Municipal Prosecuting Attorney, Or Both, Must Be Appointed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal judge; revise population threshold of cities that must appoint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Municipalities;Judiciary A | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-19 | DR - TSDP: JA To MU | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Municipalities |