MS SB2340 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-22.31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Costs And Expenses Incurred For The Rehabilitation Of Certain Historic Structures, To Provide That The Tax Credit Shall Apply To Taxpayers Who Have Been Issued A Certificate Evidencing The Eligible Credit Before December 31, 2021, Or Who, Before December 31, 2021, Have Received A Determination In Writing From The Mississippi Department Of Archives And History That The Rehabilitation Is Consistent With The Historic Character Of The Property And That The Property Meets The United States Secretary Of The Interior's Standards For Rehabilitation And Who Are Issued A Certificate Evidencing The Eligible Credit On Or After December 31, 2021; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Historic structure tax credit; extend deadline for eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Finance |