MS SB2338 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-1-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Fraud Investigation Unit Of The Department Of Human Services To Report To The State Auditor Any Suspected Civil Or Criminal Violations Relating To Program Fraud, Embezzlement Or Related Crimes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DHS Fraud Investigation Unit; require to report certain suspected civil or criminal violations to the State Auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Beckett,Bell (21st) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,England,Barrett |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Cockerham, Reynolds) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-25 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: JA To AC |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |