MS SB2337 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-21-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Transfer Of Fees Levied And Collected By The Surplus Lines Association Upon Written Request By The Commissioner Of Insurance Or The Executive Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Surplus Lines Association; transfer fees collected by the association upon written request by certain officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |