MS SB2336 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-319, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Terms "administer," "distribute," "education Employee," "possess" And "storage"; To Authorize A Person To Administer An Opioid Antagonist That Was Distributed By An Education Employee; To Authorize An Education Employee To Store, Distribute And Administer Opioid Antagonists; To Authorize The Department Of Health To Distribute Opioid Antagonists To Education Employees Upon A Request Made In Writing; To Authorize A Person To Store An Opioid Antagonist That Is Distributed By An Education Employee; To Provide That An Education Employee Shall Be Immune From Criminal And Civil Liability For Actions Authorized By This Act; To Provide That A Person Shall Be Immune From Criminal And Civil Liability For Actions Authorized By This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevention of overdoses; authorize administration of opioid antagonists by certain persons, provide immunity to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14 Approved by Governor
2023-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-07SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2023-03-02HouseReturned For Concurrence
2023-03-01HousePassed As Amended
2023-03-01HouseAmended
2023-02-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2023-02-13HouseReferred To Drug Policy
2023-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2023-02-07SenatePassed
2023-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-26SenateDR - TSDP: DP To JA
2023-01-16SenateReferred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4129319Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback