MS SB2336 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-409, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Date By Which The State, Municipality, County Or Fire Protection District Must Show Proof Of Insurance Coverage That Meets The Requirements Of The Mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Act; To Amend Section 7, Chapter 467, Laws Of 2019, As Amended By Section 2, Chapter 471, Laws Of 2020, To Revise The Effective Date Of The Mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS First Responders Health and Safety Act; delay effective date of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Zuber, Ford (54th), Miles) |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |