MS SB2335 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-11-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Limitation On The Number Of Emergency Medical Responder Students The State Fire Academy May Train Per Year; To Amend Section 83-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Municipal Fire Protection Fund To Allow Use Of Fire Rebate Monies For Emergency Medical Services Training And Equipment; To Amend Section 83-1-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The County Volunteer Fire Protection Fund To Allow Use Of Fire Rebate Monies For Emergency Medical Services Training And Equipment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Fire Academy; remove limitation on the number of Emergency Medical Responder students trained per year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Hobgood-Wilkes |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,DeLano,Horhn |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 1 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 1 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |