MS SB2328 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 69-2-13 And 69-2-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Loans For Agribusinesses From Emerging Crops Fund And To Revise Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds For Emerging Crops Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Agriculture; revise loans for agribusinesses and obligation bonds for Emerging Crops Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn |
2020-06-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hopkins, Lamar, Steverson) |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Finance |