MS SB2319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-19-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Human Services To Collaborate With The Treasurer To Intercept Unclaimed Property To Satisfy A Child Support Arrearage; To Amend Section 89-12-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Treasurer To Cooperate With The Department Of Human Services To Determine If A Claimant Of Unclaimed Property Owes A Child Support Arrearage; To Require The Treasurer To Transfer To The Department Of Human Services Any Portion Of A Claim To Satisfy The Child Support Arrearage; To Amend Section 93-11-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Subject Unclaimed Property To Interception Or Seizure Without Regard To The Entry Of The Judgment On The Judgment Roll Of The Situs District Or Jurisdiction To Satisfy Child Support Arrearages; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child support; authorize DHS to satisfy arrearages with unclaimed property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,Hood |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Boyd,Younger |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 19 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 12 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 11 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |