MS SB2308 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-5-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Elements Of The Offense Of Child Endangerment By The Sale, Transfer, Manufacture Or Possession Of Either A Controlled Substance Or A Prohibited Precursor Chemical; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child endangerment; clarify elements of the offense of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |