MS SB2283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "freedom Of Roadway Act" To Increase The Penalties For A Person Convicted Of Willfully Obstructing The Free, Convenient And Normal Use Of Any Public Passageway, Including Public Roads, Highways And Federal Interstate Highways; To Amend Section 97-35-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Increased Penalties For A First Offense; To Provide A Mandatory Term Of Imprisonment And Increased Penalties For A Second Or Subsequent Offense; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Freedom of Roadway Act; increase penalties for the obstruction of public passageways.
Sponsors
Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |