MS SB2282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-605, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Raise The Minimum Age At Which A Child May Be Committed To The State Training School And Held In Secure Detention; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Youth detention; raise minimum age for youth commitment to state training school and secure detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment Tabled |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |