MS SB2279 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 85-7-251, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Limit The Towing And Storage Charges For Vehicles Towed At The Direction Of A Law Enforcement Officer To Those Amounts Charged To Customers Generally; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Towing; limit charges.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |