MS SB2278 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Isotonitazene, Flualprazolam, Flubromazepam, Flubromazolam And Clonazolam To Schedule I Because These Drugs Have No Legitimate Medical Use And Have High Potency With Great Potential To Cause Harm; To Amend Section 41-29-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Chemical Name Of Thiafentanil; To Amend Section 41-29-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Brexanolone And Solriamfetol As Schedule Iv Controlled Substances Because The Federal Drug Administration Recently Approved These Drugs For Medical Use; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act; revise schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Drug Policy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 29 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 29 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |