MS SB2276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Desoto County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds And In-kind Donations And Support To The Desoto County Economic Development Council, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DeSoto County; authorize contributions to the DeSoto County Economic Development Council, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Committee
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation
2019-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed
2019-02-11SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback