MS SB2229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-21-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Vehicle With A Certificate Of Destruction Issued By Another State For A Water Damaged Vehicle That Has Been Declared A Total Loss To Be Issued A Branded Title If The Vehicle Has Been Restored In This State To Its Operating Condition Which Existed Prior To The Event Which Caused The Certificate Of Destruction To Be Issued; To Require Certain Other Conditions To Be Met For The Issuance Of A Branded Title To Such A Vehicle; To Provide That Vehicles With A Salvage Certificate Of Title May Not Receive A Clear Title; To Amend Section 63-21-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "certificate Of Destruction"; To Amend Section 63-21-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Branded title; may be issued to a vehicle that has been issued a certificate of destruction if certain criteria are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Finance |