MS SB2197 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 35-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize County Veteran Service Officers To Act For A Veteran For Certain Services Under A Written Power Of Attorney Authorized By The Veteran For The Purpose Of Assisting With Claims, Benefits, And Appeals In An Administrative Hearing Before The United States Department Of Veterans Affairs; To Provide County Veteran Service Officers With Legal Immunity Only For Such Actions In Cases Of Abuse, Fraud Or Breach Of Fiduciary Duty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Veteran service officers; authorize certain action on behalf of a veteran under a power of attorney, provide immunity to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |