MS SB2194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Public Community And Junior Colleges In The Definition Of The Term "claimant Agency" In The Law That Allows Certain Entities To Collect Certain Debts Through Setoff Against A Debtor's Income Tax Refund And To Expand The Types Of Debts That May Be Collected Through Such Procedure; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Debts; authorize community and junior colleges to collect through setoff against a debtor's income tax return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To UC |
2018-02-21 | House | DR - TSDP: UC To WM |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: UC To FI |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Finance |