MS SB2193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Mississippi Tourism Association Marketing Advisory Board To Assist The Mississippi Development Authority In The Planning Of Initiatives For Advertising And Promoting Tourism In Mississippi; To Establish The Membership Of Such Board; To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Divert One Percent Of Sales Tax Revenue From Restaurants And Hotels To The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund In Fiscal Year 2020, To Be Increased To Two Percent In Fiscal Year 2021 And To Three Percent In Fiscal Year 2022 And Thereafter; To Provide That The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review Shall Provide An Annual Report To The Legislature Indicating The Amount Of Funds Deposited Into The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund And A Detailed Record Of How The Funds Are Spent; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism; create advisory board and divert percentage of restaurant and hotel sales tax revenue for advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: WM To TO |
2019-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TO To WM |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-02-05 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: TO To FI |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Finance |