MS SB2189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any County Or Municipality To Offer Any Medicare-eligible Employee Supplemental Compensation If The Employee Chooses To Secure Medicare Coverage In Lieu Of Participating In Any County Or Municipal Medical Or Health Insurance Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties and municipalities; authorize to offer Medicare-eligible employees supplemental compensation if employees secure Medicare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | House | DR - TSDP: MU To CA |
2021-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To MU |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Municipalities |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |