MS SB2185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-134, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Proper Administration Of Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation (cpr) And Use Of An Automated External Defibrillator (aed) Shall Be Included As An Instructional Component Of The Physical Or Health Education Curriculum; And For Related Purposes.
Title
CPR/AED; require to be taught as instructional component of physical or health education curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed |
2015-03-04 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Education |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |