MS SB2181 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The 2022 National Championship Ole Miss Rebels Baseball Team; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The 2021 National Championship Ole Miss Rebels Women's Golf Team; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tags; authorize for 2021 and 2022 National Championship Rebels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Massengill, Lamar, Steverson) |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-02 | House | Amended |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Amended |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |