MS SB2146 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Failed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Additional Amount Of The Total Sales Tax Revenue Collected On Business Activities In Municipalities To Be Diverted To Municipalities Within The State; To Designate Such Diversion Of Revenue As The Additional Sales Tax Revenue For Municipal Infrastructure Program; To Provide That Revenue Received By A Municipality Under Such Program Shall Not Be Considered By A Municipality As General Fund Revenue And May Be Expended Solely For Water And Sewer System Projects And Road, Street And Bridge Repair, Reconstruction And Resurfacing Projects; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale tax; divert an additional amount to cities to be used to fund infrastructure projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-18SenateDied In Conference
2016-04-15HouseConferees Named Smith,Formby,Rushing
2016-04-13SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Burton,Barnett
2016-03-31SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2016-03-24HouseReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-23HousePassed As Amended
2016-03-23HouseAmended
2016-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2016-03-14HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2016-03-04SenateTransmitted To House
2016-03-04SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-03-04SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2016-03-03SenatePassed
2016-03-03SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-01SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback