MS SB2141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Terroristic Threats Law"; To Define The Elements Of The Offense Of Making A Terroristic Threat; To Provide That Making A Terroristic Threat Is A Felony Punishable By Imprisonment For Up To Ten Years; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Terroristic threat; create offense of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] |
Sen. Angela Turner-Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |