MS SB2127 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 97-41-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Cruelty To Vertebrate Animals; To Create Section 97-41-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The Crime Of Aggravated Cruelty To Any Domesticated Dog Or Cat; To Create Section 97-41-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Exemptions From Criminal Liability Under The Chapter; To Create Section 97-41-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact Definitions; To Repeal Sections 97-41-1, 97-41-5, 97-41-7, 97-41-9 And 97-41-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Deal With Animal Cruelty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Animal cruelty; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Rereferred To Agriculture;Judiciary B | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Agriculture | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |