MS SB2112 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "ban-the-box Act"; To Enact Definitions; To Prohibit Certain Public Employers From Using Criminal History Information As A Preliminary Bar To Employment; To Provide For Jurisdiction Over Complaints For Violation Of The Terms Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history; enact "Ban-the-Box Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10SenateDied In Conference
2020-06-29HouseConferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Wiggins,Witherspoon,McCaughn
2020-06-19SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-16HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: JB To WD
2020-06-04HouseDR - TSDPAA: WD To JB
2020-03-17HouseReferred To Workforce Development;Judiciary B
2020-03-10SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-09SenatePassed
2020-03-09SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-03-03SenateDR - TSDPCS: JB To LA
2020-01-17SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B;Labor

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback