MS SB2107 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-9-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit A County Or Municipality From Entering Into Any Contract Or Rental Agreement That Restricts The Possession, Carrying, Transportation, Sale, Transfer Or Ownership Of Firearms; To Provide That State Agencies May Not Interfere With The Right Of Citizens To Possess Firearms; To Create A Civil Cause Of Action To Challenge Ordinances And Regulations In Violation Of That Right; To Exempt State Law Enforcement Agencies From Regulating Law Enforcement Officers In The Course Of Their Official Duties; To Amend Section 45-9-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Firearms; prohibit local governments and state agencies from restricting possession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Barnett,Owen |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,DeBar,Hill |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 9 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 9 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |