MS SB2106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-25-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Off-duty Use Of Municipal And County Police Vehicles By Certain Law Enforcement Officers Engaging In Private Employment; To Provide That Use Must Be Approved By The Local Governmental Entity Whose Vehicle Is Involved; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Off-duty law enforcement officers; authorized to use public vehicles for private security duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |