MS SB2092 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review (peer) To Review, In 2024 And Every Four Years Thereafter, Advertising And Marketing Efforts Paid For Through The Mississippi Development Authority (mda) Tourism Advertising Fund, Including The Effectiveness Of Attracting Out-of-state Visitors, The Effectiveness Of Digital Advertising Efforts, And The Administration And Oversight By Mda Regarding Tourism Advertising Fund Expenditures; To Require Peer To Provide A Report To The Lieutenant Governor, The Speaker Of The House, The Chairs Of The Senate And House Tourism Committees, And The Governor No Later Than December 1, 2024, And Every Four Years Thereafter; To Allow Peer To Contract With A Private Contractor To Conduct The Review Or Any Part Thereof; To Provide For The Payment Of The Private Contractor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Development Authority; require periodic PEER review of effectiveness of Tourism Advertising Fund expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Tourism |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To AC |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |