MS SB2090 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Conditional Release Of An Offender To The United States Immigration And Customs Enforcement Agency; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Parole; provide for conditional release of an offender to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |