MS SB2083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-41-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Public Body Enters Into Executive Session, The Body Must Invite Any Member Of Its Legislative Advisory Or Oversight Committee, If Present, To Stay During The Executive Session; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Open meetings; legislative advisory committee members must be invited to stay during executive session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Tabled |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |