MS SB2062 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round Of Fire Trucks For Counties And Municipalities Under The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; authorize an additional round for counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] | Sen. Kathy Chism [R] | Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Michel,Tate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-03 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |