MS SB2050 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review (peer) To Review, In 2025 And Every Four Years Thereafter, Advertising And Marketing Efforts Paid For Through The Mississippi Development Authority (mda) Tourism Advertising Fund, Including The Effectiveness Of Attracting Out-of-state Visitors, The Effectiveness Of Digital Advertising Efforts, And The Administration And Oversight By Mda Regarding Tourism Advertising Fund Expenditures; To Require Peer To Provide A Report To The Lieutenant Governor, The Speaker Of The House, The Chairs Of The Senate And House Tourism Committees, And The Governor No Later Than December 1, 2025, And Every Four Years Thereafter; To Allow Peer To Contract With A Private Contractor To Conduct The Review Or Any Part Thereof; To Provide For The Payment Of The Private Contractor; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Development Authority; require periodic PEER review of effectiveness of Tourism Advertising Fund expenditures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateDied In Committee
2023-01-25SenateDR - TSDP: TO To AC
2023-01-09SenateReferred To Tourism;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback