MS SB2050 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require School Districts To Accept An Application For Enrollment And Course Registration By Electronic Means For Any Pupil Whose Parent Is Transferred To, Or Is Pending Transfer To, A Military Installation Within This State While On Active Military Duty Pursuant To An Official Military Order; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School enrollment; allow for children with documentation of a parent's pending military relocation to the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Point of Order - Well Taken |
2019-03-12 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2019-03-12 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2019-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Education |