MS SB2048 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In Cases Of Reports Of Child Abuse Or Neglect To The Department Of Child Protection Services, If The Department Determines That A Parent Or Other Person Responsible For The Care Or Welfare Of An Abused Or Neglected Child Maintains Active Duty Status Within The Military, Then The Department Shall Notify The Applicable Military Installation Family Advocacy Program That There Is An Allegation Of Abuse Or Neglect That Relates To That Child; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child abuse; require CPS to notify applicable military installation family advocacy program in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |