MS SB2019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 81-22-1 Through 81-22-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, And To Amend Section 81-22-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Mississippi Debt Management Services Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Debt Management Services Act; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
81 | 22 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 22 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |