MS SB2001 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Alyce G. Clarke Mississippi Lottery Law To Establish A State Lottery; To Create The Mississippi Lottery Corporation To Administer The State Lottery; To Provide That The Affairs Of The Corporation Shall Be Administered And Governed By A Board Of Directors Appointed By The Governor With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; To Provide The Terms Of Office And Powers And Duties Of The Board; To Provide That The Mississippi Lottery Corporation Shall Be Managed By A President Selected By The Board With The Approval Of The Governor; To Provide That The President Shall Serve At The Pleasure Of The Board; To Provide For The Powers And Duties Of The President; To Authorize The Board To Employ Legal Counsel; To Require Background Investigation Of Applicants For Employment With The Corporation; To Provide For The Disposition Of Proceeds Received From The Sale Of Lottery Tickets; To Provide For Appeals By Retailers, Vendors Or Applicants Aggrieved By Decisions Of The President Or The Board Of Directors; To Prohibit The Sale Of Lottery Tickets To Anyone Under The Age Of 21; To Provide The Manner In Which Prizes May Be Paid And To Authorize The Voluntary Assignment Of Prizes; To Provide For The Selection Of Lottery Ticket Retailers And The Requirements That Must Be Met To Become A Retailer; To Provide That The Proceeds From The Sale Of Lottery Tickets And Received By A Lottery Retailer Shall Constitute A Trust; To Place Certain Requirements On Vendors Of Goods Or Services Necessary For The Implementation Of The State Lottery; To Provide For Criminal Background Investigations By The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety On Potential Vendors, Potential Retailers And Certain Employees Of The Corporation; To Make Unlawful Certain Acts With Regard To The State Lottery; To Provide For The Disposition Of Proceeds Received From The Sale Of Lottery Tickets; To Provide That The Net Proceeds Collected From The Sale Of Lottery Tickets Shall Be Deposited Into A Lottery Proceeds Fund Created In The State Treasury For Various Purposes; To Amend Section 7-7-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Audit To Review And Approve Any Independent Auditor Selected By The Mississippi Lottery Corporation To Conduct An Annual Audit Of The Corporation And To Conduct Audits Or Investigations Of The Mississippi Lottery Corporation If In The Opinion Of The State Auditor Conditions Justify Such Audits Or Investigations; To Amend Sections 25-9-107, 25-11-103, 25-41-3, 31-7-13, 67-1-71, 97-33-9, 97-33-11, 97-33-13, 97-33-21, 97-33-23, 97-33-31, 97-33-33, 97-33-35, 97-33-37, 97-33-39, 97-33-41, 97-33-43, 97-33-45, 97-33-47 And 97-33-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery; create and establish the Mississippi Lottery Corporation to administer the lottery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 55 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - House - House Conference Report Failed (Y: 54 N: 60 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31 Approved by Governor
2018-08-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-08-29SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-08-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2018-08-28HouseReconsidered
2018-08-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2018-08-27HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Patterson, Eure, Burnett, Bennett)
2018-08-27HouseConference Report Failed
2018-08-27HouseConference Report Filed
2018-08-27SenateConference Report Filed
2018-08-27HouseConferees Named Eure,Bennett,Burnett
2018-08-27SenateConferees Named Simmons (13th),Burton,Harkins
2018-08-27SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2018-08-24HouseReturned For Concurrence
2018-08-24HouseImmediate Release
2018-08-24HousePassed As Amended
2018-08-24HouseAmended
2018-08-24HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-08-24HouseReferred To Gaming
2018-08-24SenateTransmitted To House
2018-08-24SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2018-08-24SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2018-08-23SenatePassed As Amended
2018-08-23SenateAmended
2018-08-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-08-23SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/history/SB/SB2001.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2001IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2001PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2001SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_00.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_04.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_05.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_06.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2001_S_Amend_07.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Subst_1_for_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_03_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_04_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_05_to_Cmte_Amend_01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_06_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_07_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2001_H_Amend_08_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/senate/0010006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/house/0020003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/senate/0020003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/house/0050005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/senate/0050005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/house/0060004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback