MS HR98 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Belmont High School Lady Cardinals Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Chris Higginbottom For Winning The Mhsaa Class 3a State Championship And For Their Outstanding 2009-2010 Season.
Title
Belmont High School Girls Basketball Team; commend on winning Class 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Rules |