MS HR92 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution Commending The Service And Leadership That Floyd Douglas "dug" Davis Provided To The Lawrence County, Mississippi, Summer Baseball Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Floyd Douglas "Dug" Davis; commend service and leadership provided to the Lawrence County summer baseball program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-20HouseAdopted
2019-03-19HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-14HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback