MS HR84 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Acknowledging And Honoring The Impeccable Artistry, Craftsmanship, Talent And Impactful Contributions To The Entertainment Industry Of Ms. Alice Walker, Upon Her Induction Into The 2022 Class Of The Mississippi Arts + Entertainment Experience Hall Of Fame.
Title
Alice Walker; commend induction into the 2022 Class of the Mississippi Arts + Entertainment Experience Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-23 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |