MS HR82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life, Legacy And Service Of Mr. Ira S. Polk, Jr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Ira S. Polk, Jr.; mourn the loss and commemorate the life and legacy of upon his passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |