MS HR81 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Congratulating The Mississippi State University "lady Bulldogs" Women's Basketball Team And Head Coach Vic Schaefer For Winning The University's First Southeastern Conference Tournament Championship.
Title
Mississippi State University "Lady Bulldogs" Women's Basketball Team; commend and congratulate on winning first SEC Tournament Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |